THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:56:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Medical Diagnostics Unit
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 847-9779
Fax: (905) 847-7667
Address: 11 Bronte Rd, Unit 33
Oakville Ontario L6L 3B6
Phone: (905) 847-9779
Fax: (905) 847-7667

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanaz Piran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Piran (CPSO#: 81131 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Medical Diagnostics Unit
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 847-9779
Fax: (905) 847-7667
Address: 11 Bronte Rd, Unit 33
Oakville Ontario L6L 3B6
Phone: (905) 847-9779
Fax: (905) 847-7667

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanaz Piran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Piran (CPSO#: 81131 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANAZ PIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANAZ PIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004