THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:34:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
Suite 201
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-8086
Fax: (613) 761-1944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tsimiklis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tsimiklis (CPSO#: 81152 )
Business Address: Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
1370 Clyde Avenue
Suite 201
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 722-8086

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
Suite 201
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-8086
Fax: (613) 761-1944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tsimiklis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tsimiklis (CPSO#: 81152 )
Business Address: Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
1370 Clyde Avenue
Suite 201
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 722-8086

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGIOS TSIMIKLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIMIKLIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGIOS TSIMIKLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIMIKLIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004