THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 02:58:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-2437 Princess St
Kingston ON K7M 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-530-4515
Extension: 202
Fax: 613-344-1365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Kondor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kondor (CPSO#: 81158 )
Business Address: 34 Barrie Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3J7
(613) 548-3232 Extn: 6204
Business Address: 200-2437 Princess St
Kingston ON K7M 3G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-2437 Princess St
Kingston ON K7M 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-530-4515
Extension: 202
Fax: 613-344-1365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Kondor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kondor (CPSO#: 81158 )
Business Address: 34 Barrie Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3J7
(613) 548-3232 Extn: 6204
Business Address: 200-2437 Princess St
Kingston ON K7M 3G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE MARIA KONDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONDOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE MARIA KONDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONDOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004