THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-9942
Fax: (705) 222-0070
Address: Suite 3-22B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5M4
Phone: 705-222-9942
Fax: (705) 222-0070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Shum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shum (CPSO#: 81161 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: Suite 3-22B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5M4
(705) 222-9942

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-9942
Fax: (705) 222-0070
Address: Suite 3-22B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5M4
Phone: 705-222-9942
Fax: (705) 222-0070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Shum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shum (CPSO#: 81161 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: Suite 3-22B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5M4
(705) 222-9942

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY BRIAN SHUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY BRIAN SHUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004