THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:35:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 3802
Fax: (613) 748-4914

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chow (CPSO#: 81163 )
Business Address: 1140 Av Beaumont
Braxia Health
Mont-Royal QC H3P 3E5
514-481-7867
Business Address: C190 - 1 Westmount Square
Montreal Quebec H3Z 2P9
(514) 931-5500
Business Address: 881 boul de Maisonneuve Est
Montreal Quebec H2L 1Y8
(514) 506-8385
Business Address: The Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 895 March Road
Kanata plastic and cosmetic surgery clinic
Ottawa Ontario K2K 1X7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 3802
Fax: (613) 748-4914

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chow (CPSO#: 81163 )
Business Address: 1140 Av Beaumont
Braxia Health
Mont-Royal QC H3P 3E5
514-481-7867
Business Address: C190 - 1 Westmount Square
Montreal Quebec H3Z 2P9
(514) 931-5500
Business Address: 881 boul de Maisonneuve Est
Montreal Quebec H2L 1Y8
(514) 506-8385
Business Address: The Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 895 March Road
Kanata plastic and cosmetic surgery clinic
Ottawa Ontario K2K 1X7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER AUDREY CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER AUDREY CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004