THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:29:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street,
L4-000, Box #13
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Paolo Mazzotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mazzotta (CPSO#: 81172 )
Business Address: 12 Humewood Dr
York ON M6C 2W2

Corporation Name: Dr. Paolo Mazzotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street,
L4-000, Box #13
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Paolo Mazzotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mazzotta (CPSO#: 81172 )
Business Address: 12 Humewood Dr
York ON M6C 2W2

Corporation Name: Dr. Paolo Mazzotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAOLO MAZZOTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZOTTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAOLO MAZZOTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZOTTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004