THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Almalki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Almalki (CPSO#: 81174 )

Corporation Name: Y. Almalki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Almalki (CPSO#: 81174 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Almalki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Almalki (CPSO#: 81174 )

Corporation Name: Y. Almalki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Almalki (CPSO#: 81174 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSSEF ALMALKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMALKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSSEF ALMALKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMALKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004