THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 21
1098 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 458-6999
Fax: (905) 458-5202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smeeksha Sur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sur (CPSO#: 81179 )
Business Address: Unit 21
1098 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3A5
(905) 458-6999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 21
1098 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 458-6999
Fax: (905) 458-5202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smeeksha Sur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sur (CPSO#: 81179 )
Business Address: Unit 21
1098 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3A5
(905) 458-6999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SMEEKSHA SINGH SUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SMEEKSHA SINGH SUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Punjab University India, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2004