THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 306-1449
Fax: (905) 306-1450

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Physiotherapy Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Physiotherapy
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Behzad Taromi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Taromi (CPSO#: 81183 )
Business Address: Suite 203
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1E3
(905) 306-1449

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 306-1449
Fax: (905) 306-1450

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Physiotherapy Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Physiotherapy
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Behzad Taromi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Taromi (CPSO#: 81183 )
Business Address: Suite 203
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1E3
(905) 306-1449

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHZAD TAROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAROMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHZAD TAROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAROMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004