THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Eastern Ontario
Health Centre For Kids
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Extension: 1848
Fax: (705) 523-8232

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantal Corbeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Corbeil (CPSO#: 81189 )
Business Address: North Eastern Onatrio
Health Centre for Kids
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7120 Extn: 4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Eastern Ontario
Health Centre For Kids
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Extension: 1848
Fax: (705) 523-8232

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantal Corbeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Corbeil (CPSO#: 81189 )
Business Address: North Eastern Onatrio
Health Centre for Kids
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7120 Extn: 4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTAL PAULA CORBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBEIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTAL PAULA CORBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBEIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Mar 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004