THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:49:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 399
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: (807) 229-2672

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megen Brunskill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brunskill (CPSO#: 81191 )
Business Address: 22 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
(807) 229-3243

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 399
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: (807) 229-2672

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megen Brunskill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brunskill (CPSO#: 81191 )
Business Address: 22 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
(807) 229-3243

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGEN THERESA BRUNSKILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNSKILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGEN THERESA BRUNSKILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNSKILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004