THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:40:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 251 Davenport Road
FACE
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 479-4244
Fax: (416) 920-4244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Asaria (CPSO#: 81200 )
Business Address: 251 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9
(416) 479-4244

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 251 Davenport Road
FACE
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 479-4244
Fax: (416) 920-4244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Asaria (CPSO#: 81200 )
Business Address: 251 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9
(416) 479-4244

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIL ASARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASARIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIL ASARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASARIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004