THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:29:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 172
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4920
Fax: (416) 480-4933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noor Niyar N. Ladhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ladhani (CPSO#: 81206 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 172
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4920

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 172
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4920
Fax: (416) 480-4933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noor Niyar N. Ladhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ladhani (CPSO#: 81206 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 172
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4920

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOOR NIYAR NAZEER LADHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADHANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOOR NIYAR NAZEER LADHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADHANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004