THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Cancer Program
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Extension: 58000
Fax: (519) 253-4204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Swati Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 81220 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
(519) 253-5253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Cancer Program
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Extension: 58000
Fax: (519) 253-4204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Swati Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 81220 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
(519) 253-5253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SWATI KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SWATI KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004