THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:15:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9A 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.R. Cooray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cooray (CPSO#: 81225 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, SINHALESE
Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9A 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.R. Cooray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cooray (CPSO#: 81225 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANURAD RUWAN COORAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COORAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANURAD RUWAN COORAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COORAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004