THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:57:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihab K. Louis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Louis (CPSO#: 81233 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihab K. Louis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Louis (CPSO#: 81233 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IHAB KAMAL LOUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IHAB KAMAL LOUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004