THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:34:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Address: 7990 Kennedy Rd S
Brampton Ontario L6W 4L3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Women's College Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 45 Mill St.
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5A 3R6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 20 Jan 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 20 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Perla Lansang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lansang (CPSO#: 81238 )
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7500
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400
Business Address: 45 Mill Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3R6
(416) 869-3376
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
M100-2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Address: 7990 Kennedy Rd S
Brampton Ontario L6W 4L3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Women's College Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 45 Mill St.
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5A 3R6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 20 Jan 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 20 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Perla Lansang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lansang (CPSO#: 81238 )
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7500
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400
Business Address: 45 Mill Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3R6
(416) 869-3376
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
M100-2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA PERLA LUCILA ESTEVEZ TECSON LANSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANSANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA PERLA LUCILA ESTEVEZ TECSON LANSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANSANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004