THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:38:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baroda University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Seniors' Health Clinic
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 521-4090
Fax: (416) 521-4116

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Joshipura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joshipura (CPSO#: 81239 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Suite G 253
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: Medical Clinic
Trillium Health Centre
West Toronto Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MALAYALAM
Medical School: Baroda University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Seniors' Health Clinic
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 521-4090
Fax: (416) 521-4116

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Joshipura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joshipura (CPSO#: 81239 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Suite G 253
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: Medical Clinic
Trillium Health Centre
West Toronto Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINI GAURAV JOSHIPURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHIPURA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINI GAURAV JOSHIPURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHIPURA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baroda University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004