THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:58:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 688-2863
Fax: (613) 688-2864

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shane Hadlock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hadlock (CPSO#: 81258 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 688-2863

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 688-2863
Fax: (613) 688-2864

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shane Hadlock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hadlock (CPSO#: 81258 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 688-2863

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANE DAVID HADLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADLOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANE DAVID HADLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADLOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004