THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2275 Britannia Rd W
unit 9
Mississauga ON L5M 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 567 2525
Fax: 905 567 5995
Address: 6005 Erin Mills Parkway
unit 106
Mississauga Ontario L5N 0E9
Phone: 905 812 8526
Fax: 905 821 2033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saima Amjad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amjad (CPSO#: 81264 )
Business Address: 4 - 1 Glenn Hawthorne Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5R 0C2
(905) 366-0505
Business Address: 9-2275 Britannia Rd W
Mississauga ON L5M 2G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2275 Britannia Rd W
unit 9
Mississauga ON L5M 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 567 2525
Fax: 905 567 5995
Address: 6005 Erin Mills Parkway
unit 106
Mississauga Ontario L5N 0E9
Phone: 905 812 8526
Fax: 905 821 2033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saima Amjad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amjad (CPSO#: 81264 )
Business Address: 4 - 1 Glenn Hawthorne Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5R 0C2
(905) 366-0505
Business Address: 9-2275 Britannia Rd W
Mississauga ON L5M 2G6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIMA AMJAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIMA AMJAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004