THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:44:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 324-4100
Fax: (416) 324-4181

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pripstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pripstein (CPSO#: 81273 )
Business Address: 333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
(416) 324-4100
Business Address: 45 Good Fellowship Road
Seguin Ontario P2A 0B2
(705) 732-6964

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 324-4100
Fax: (416) 324-4181

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pripstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pripstein (CPSO#: 81273 )
Business Address: 333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
(416) 324-4100
Business Address: 45 Good Fellowship Road
Seguin Ontario P2A 0B2
(705) 732-6964

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA PEARL PRIPSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIPSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA PEARL PRIPSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIPSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004