THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:25:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82573
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Antoine Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Brown (CPSO#: 81290 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 82573
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
(613) 632-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82573
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Antoine Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Brown (CPSO#: 81290 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 82573
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
(613) 632-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE ANTOINE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE ANTOINE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004