THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:15:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto ON M6K 2R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monika Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapoor (CPSO#: 81293 )
Business Address: 10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z2
(647) 827-9200
Business Address: University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
RFE-GS-480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3946
Business Address: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Rehabilitation Instititute - Bickle Site
Department of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Toronto ON M6K 2R7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto ON M6K 2R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monika Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapoor (CPSO#: 81293 )
Business Address: 10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z2
(647) 827-9200
Business Address: University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
RFE-GS-480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3946
Business Address: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Rehabilitation Instititute - Bickle Site
Department of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Toronto ON M6K 2R7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIKA KAPOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPOOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIKA KAPOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPOOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004