THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Suite 8238
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 371-8381
Fax: (519) 371-8399

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Savasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Savasi (CPSO#: 81301 )
Business Address: Suite 8238
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 371-8381

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Suite 8238
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 371-8381
Fax: (519) 371-8399

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Savasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Savasi (CPSO#: 81301 )
Business Address: Suite 8238
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 371-8381

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INGRID SAVASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVASI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INGRID SAVASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVASI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004