THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:25:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10376 Yonge Street
unit 108
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 918-1358
Fax: (905) 918-0392
Address: 100 McLevin Ave.
Muslim Welfare Centre of Toronto
Suite#4 & 4A Scarborough, ON M1B 5K
Scarborough Ontario M1B 5K1
Phone: (416) 754-8116
Fax: (416) 754-4468

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kanjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kanjee (CPSO#: 81312 )
Business Address: Suite 108
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B8
(905) 918-1358

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10376 Yonge Street
unit 108
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 918-1358
Fax: (905) 918-0392
Address: 100 McLevin Ave.
Muslim Welfare Centre of Toronto
Suite#4 & 4A Scarborough, ON M1B 5K
Scarborough Ontario M1B 5K1
Phone: (416) 754-8116
Fax: (416) 754-4468

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kanjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kanjee (CPSO#: 81312 )
Business Address: Suite 108
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B8
(905) 918-1358

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANJUM SHABBIR KANJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANJEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANJUM SHABBIR KANJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANJEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004