THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Extension: 58439
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health Sytem
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 43128
Fax: (905) 704-4195
Address: William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V1R8
Phone: 4164942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sudan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samia H. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali (CPSO#: 81314 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 58439
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 43128

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Extension: 58439
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health Sytem
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 43128
Fax: (905) 704-4195
Address: William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V1R8
Phone: 4164942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sudan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samia H. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali (CPSO#: 81314 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 58439
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 43128

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIA HAMID AHMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIA HAMID AHMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004