THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:40:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN, YUGOSLAV

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Health Care London
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6370
Fax: (519) 646-6109
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Rm. E6-117
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3584
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tamara Spaic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Spaic (CPSO#: 81327 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-3584
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Care
Division of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room B5 - 110
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN, YUGOSLAV
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Health Care London
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6370
Fax: (519) 646-6109
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Rm. E6-117
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3584
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tamara Spaic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Spaic (CPSO#: 81327 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-3584
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Care
Division of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room B5 - 110
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6370

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA SPAIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPAIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA SPAIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPAIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004