THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: MacNeil-Covin, Lisa Catherine Ann (Used Until: 14 Dec 2008)
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201 Queen St
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 396-6768
Fax: (866) 966-1940

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Scott (CPSO#: 81341 )
Business Address: Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
(519) 396-6768

General Information

Former Name: MacNeil-Covin, Lisa Catherine Ann (Used Until: 14 Dec 2008)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201 Queen St
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 396-6768
Fax: (866) 966-1940

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Scott (CPSO#: 81341 )
Business Address: Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
(519) 396-6768

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA CATHERINE ANN SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA CATHERINE ANN SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004