THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
13-1 High Meadow Pl
North York, ON
M9L 0A3
Canada
Phone #: 1 800 775 0093
Fax #: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 18 Sep 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.S. Ardelean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ardelean (CPSO#: 81368 )
Business Address: 205-1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 474-7007
Business Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
13-1 High Meadow Pl
North York, ON
M9L 0A3
Canada
Phone #: 1 800 775 0093
Fax #: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 18 Sep 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.S. Ardelean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ardelean (CPSO#: 81368 )
Business Address: 205-1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 474-7007
Business Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA SIMONA ARDELEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARDELEAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA SIMONA ARDELEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARDELEAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004