THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:17:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph North End Family Medical
211-83 Dawson Rd
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 780-0375
Fax: (519)780-0080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manuela G. Tudor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tudor (CPSO#: 81369 )
Business Address: Guelph North End Family Medical
211 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 780-0375

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph North End Family Medical
211-83 Dawson Rd
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 780-0375
Fax: (519)780-0080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manuela G. Tudor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tudor (CPSO#: 81369 )
Business Address: Guelph North End Family Medical
211 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 780-0375

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANUELA GEORGETA TUDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUDOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANUELA GEORGETA TUDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUDOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004