THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:40:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Isfahan University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7191 Yonge Street
suit# 207
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maryam Mohammady Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohammady (CPSO#: 81371 )
Business Address: 207 - 7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario M2M 3W2
(905) 597-5919

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Isfahan University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7191 Yonge Street
suit# 207
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maryam Mohammady Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohammady (CPSO#: 81371 )
Business Address: 207 - 7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario M2M 3W2
(905) 597-5919

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM MOHAMMADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM MOHAMMADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Isfahan University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004