THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:45:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: Yasser, Zaid Jabbar (Used Until: 19 Dec 2017)
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
The Court Offices
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite #418
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-7000
Fax: (416) 340-7001
Address: Canadian Place Endoscopy
1065 Canadian Place
Unit 122
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
Phone: 416 626 2100
Fax: 416 620 7874
Address: 6th. Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 416 757 3237
Fax: 416 757 7189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaid J. Yasser Siger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Siger (CPSO#: 81372 )
Business Address: Unit 11 & 12
390 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X2
(905) 882-6566
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
6th Floor
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
(416) 757-3237
Business Address: Unit 122-12
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
(416) 626-2100
Business Address: 2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 418
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 340-7000

General Information

Former Name: Yasser, Zaid Jabbar (Used Until: 19 Dec 2017)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
The Court Offices
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite #418
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-7000
Fax: (416) 340-7001
Address: Canadian Place Endoscopy
1065 Canadian Place
Unit 122
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
Phone: 416 626 2100
Fax: 416 620 7874
Address: 6th. Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 416 757 3237
Fax: 416 757 7189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaid J. Yasser Siger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Siger (CPSO#: 81372 )
Business Address: Unit 11 & 12
390 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X2
(905) 882-6566
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
6th Floor
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
(416) 757-3237
Business Address: Unit 122-12
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
(416) 626-2100
Business Address: 2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 418
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 340-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAID J YASSER SIGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAID J YASSER SIGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004