THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 17:57:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Best Care Medical Centre
720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
unit 4
Mississauga Ontario L5C 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-8686
Fax: (905) 848-8796

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thompson (CPSO#: 81375 )
Business Address: New Best Care Medical Centre
720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Suite 4
Mississauga Ontario L5C 3G1
(905) 848-8686

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Best Care Medical Centre
720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
unit 4
Mississauga Ontario L5C 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-8686
Fax: (905) 848-8796

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thompson (CPSO#: 81375 )
Business Address: New Best Care Medical Centre
720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Suite 4
Mississauga Ontario L5C 3G1
(905) 848-8686

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA PATRICIA GAYE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA PATRICIA GAYE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004