THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 631 Queenston Road
Maliha Sherman Medicine Prof. Corp
Unit 204
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-662-2231
Fax: 905-662-2233

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maliha Sherman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sherman (CPSO#: 81376 )
Business Address: 68 Centennial Parkway South
Suite 203
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2C5
(905) 662-2231

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SWAHILI
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 631 Queenston Road
Maliha Sherman Medicine Prof. Corp
Unit 204
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-662-2231
Fax: 905-662-2233

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maliha Sherman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sherman (CPSO#: 81376 )
Business Address: 68 Centennial Parkway South
Suite 203
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2C5
(905) 662-2231

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALIHA ALI HASS SHERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALIHA ALI HASS SHERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004