THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:13:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: Soliman, Rasha Gamil Salib (Used Until: 29 May 2006)
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Landing Medical Clinic
Suite 406
250 Dundas St. West (Fourth Floor)
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 270-1999
Fax: (905) 270-1777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Wahba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wahba (CPSO#: 81383 )
Business Address: 250 Dundas St W
Suite 406
Mississauga ON L5B 1J2
(905) 270-1999

General Information

Former Name: Soliman, Rasha Gamil Salib (Used Until: 29 May 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Landing Medical Clinic
Suite 406
250 Dundas St. West (Fourth Floor)
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 270-1999
Fax: (905) 270-1777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Wahba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wahba (CPSO#: 81383 )
Business Address: 250 Dundas St W
Suite 406
Mississauga ON L5B 1J2
(905) 270-1999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHA GAMIL WAHBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAHBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHA GAMIL WAHBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAHBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004