THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:22:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A2
3980 Grand Park Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 615-0107
Fax: (905) 615-1711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Makram Mikail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mikail (CPSO#: 81384 )
Business Address: A2 - 3980 Grant Park Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M6
(905) 615-0107

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A2
3980 Grand Park Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 615-0107
Fax: (905) 615-1711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Makram Mikail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mikail (CPSO#: 81384 )
Business Address: A2 - 3980 Grant Park Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M6
(905) 615-0107

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZZA MAKRAM MIKAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZZA MAKRAM MIKAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004