THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 659 Dundas Street East
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: (519) 642 1532
Address: Oxford Medical Walk-In Clinic
Suite 102
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 433-4999
Fax: (519) 433-4151

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huma A. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Alam (CPSO#: 81410 )
Business Address: Oxford Medical Walk-In Clinic
102 - 140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 433-4999
Business Address: 659 Dundas Street East
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
(519) 660-0874

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 659 Dundas Street East
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: (519) 642 1532
Address: Oxford Medical Walk-In Clinic
Suite 102
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 433-4999
Fax: (519) 433-4151

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huma A. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Alam (CPSO#: 81410 )
Business Address: Oxford Medical Walk-In Clinic
102 - 140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 433-4999
Business Address: 659 Dundas Street East
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
(519) 660-0874

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMA AFTAB ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMA AFTAB ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004