THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:06:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Stanford University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Room D4-08
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5723
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Courtney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Courtney (CPSO#: 81416 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A-253
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5723

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Stanford University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Room D4-08
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5723
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Courtney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Courtney (CPSO#: 81416 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A-253
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5723

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN KENT COURTNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COURTNEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN KENT COURTNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COURTNEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Stanford University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004