THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:20:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bioflax Medical Centre,
Unit 6, 121 Highway 20 East
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 892-7728
Fax: (905) 892-7811

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Foluso A. Ola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ola (CPSO#: 81417 )
Business Address: 6 - 121 Highway 20 East
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E0
(905) 892-7728

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bioflax Medical Centre,
Unit 6, 121 Highway 20 East
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 892-7728
Fax: (905) 892-7811

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Foluso A. Ola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ola (CPSO#: 81417 )
Business Address: 6 - 121 Highway 20 East
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E0
(905) 892-7728

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FOLUSO AYOMITUNDE OLUSEGUN OLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FOLUSO AYOMITUNDE OLUSEGUN OLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 17 Nov 2023
Hearing Date(s): May 26, 27, 28 & June 5, 2025
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Ola’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.  It is alleged that Dr. Ola failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to maintain appropriate professional boundaries with these patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Ola is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover. It is further alleged that Dr. Ola engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including but not limited to inappropriately billing the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, including for services not rendered; and providing and/or billing for services not clinically indicated
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 May 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 17 Nov 2023
Hearing Date(s): May 26, 27, 28 & June 5, 2025
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Ola’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.  It is alleged that Dr. Ola failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to maintain appropriate professional boundaries with these patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Ola is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover. It is further alleged that Dr. Ola engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including but not limited to inappropriately billing the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, including for services not rendered; and providing and/or billing for services not clinically indicated
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 May 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2004