THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Address: 200 ELIZABETH St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3128
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Riazi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Riazi (CPSO#: 81428 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3128
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5118

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Address: 200 ELIZABETH St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3128
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Riazi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Riazi (CPSO#: 81428 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3128
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5118

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA RIAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIAZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA RIAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIAZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004