THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: (705) 671-5458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyle McKechnie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKechnie (CPSO#: 81431 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: (705) 671-5458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyle McKechnie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKechnie (CPSO#: 81431 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLE STUART MCKECHNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKECHNIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLE STUART MCKECHNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKECHNIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004