THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:39:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital
General campus
3050 Lawrence Ave east
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 4382911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4839 Leslie street(nymark plaza)
North York Ontario M2J 2K8
Phone: 416 498 0808
Fax: 416 498 1211

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonia Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Simon (CPSO#: 81438 )
Business Address: 4839 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2J 2K8
(416) 498-0808
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital
General campus
3050 Lawrence Ave east
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 4382911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4839 Leslie street(nymark plaza)
North York Ontario M2J 2K8
Phone: 416 498 0808
Fax: 416 498 1211

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonia Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Simon (CPSO#: 81438 )
Business Address: 4839 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2J 2K8
(416) 498-0808
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA HENRY SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA HENRY SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004