THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:29:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaethesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Extension: 2218
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayman Rofaeel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rofaeel (CPSO#: 81443 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaethesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Extension: 2218
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayman Rofaeel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rofaeel (CPSO#: 81443 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMAN SEDKI HAKIM ROFAEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROFAEEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMAN SEDKI HAKIM ROFAEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROFAEEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mansoura University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004