THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:11:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Boparai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boparai (CPSO#: 81452 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Address: 125 Pedersen Drive
Unit 3, 4, 5
Aurora Ontario L4G 0E3
Business Address: 102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 533-6336
Business Address: 250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite B02
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0595
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 679 Davis Drive
Suite 104
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 895-1313
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(647) 895-2301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Boparai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boparai (CPSO#: 81452 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Address: 125 Pedersen Drive
Unit 3, 4, 5
Aurora Ontario L4G 0E3
Business Address: 102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 533-6336
Business Address: 250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite B02
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0595
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 679 Davis Drive
Suite 104
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 895-1313
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(647) 895-2301

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS KIRANPAL S BOPARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOPARAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS KIRANPAL S BOPARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOPARAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004