THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:42:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (416) 281-7438
Address: Lakeridge Health
Ajax and Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Ave South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Bay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bay (CPSO#: 81455 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (416) 281-7438
Address: Lakeridge Health
Ajax and Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Ave South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Bay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bay (CPSO#: 81455 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIEL MICHAEL BAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIEL MICHAEL BAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004