THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Norton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2N 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-901-5736
Fax: 416-901-5768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dawn Shi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shi (CPSO#: 81478 )
Business Address: 20 Norton Avenue
North York Ontario M2N 0C6
(416) 901-5786

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Norton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2N 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-901-5736
Fax: 416-901-5768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dawn Shi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shi (CPSO#: 81478 )
Business Address: 20 Norton Avenue
North York Ontario M2N 0C6
(416) 901-5786

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAWN DONGHUI SHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAWN DONGHUI SHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004