THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-7191 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-935 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2T7
Phone: 416 635 6060
Fax: 416 764 5620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Mahmoudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mahmoudi (CPSO#: 81486 )
Business Address: 27 Closs Sq
Aurora ON L4G 5H6
Business Address: 207-7191 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-7191 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-935 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2T7
Phone: 416 635 6060
Fax: 416 764 5620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Mahmoudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mahmoudi (CPSO#: 81486 )
Business Address: 27 Closs Sq
Aurora ON L4G 5H6
Business Address: 207-7191 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI MAHMOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI MAHMOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004