THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-807-684-6316
Fax: 807-684-5853
Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street
Grimsby Ontario L3M1P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CIBC Breast Assessment Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V1C1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 387-4551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M4N4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Merrivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario
K2G3H8
Ottawa Ontario K2G3H8
Phone: (613) 727-1072
Fax: (613) 727-5873
Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y1T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 503-435 The Boardwalk
Karma Ultrasound
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2
Phone: 519 570 3660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thomson (CPSO#: 81494 )
Business Address: Merivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Avenue East
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 727-1072
Business Address: 307 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5Z8
(519) 570-3660
Business Address: 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 828-2066
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(905) 387-4551
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(905) 828-2066

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-807-684-6316
Fax: 807-684-5853
Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street
Grimsby Ontario L3M1P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CIBC Breast Assessment Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V1C1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 387-4551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M4N4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Merrivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario
K2G3H8
Ottawa Ontario K2G3H8
Phone: (613) 727-1072
Fax: (613) 727-5873
Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y1T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 503-435 The Boardwalk
Karma Ultrasound
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2
Phone: 519 570 3660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thomson (CPSO#: 81494 )
Business Address: Merivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Avenue East
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 727-1072
Business Address: 307 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5Z8
(519) 570-3660
Business Address: 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 828-2066
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(905) 387-4551
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(905) 828-2066

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA LYNN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA LYNN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004