THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:44:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 McNabb Street
group health centre
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Curran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Curran (CPSO#: 81544 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 McNabb Street
group health centre
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Curran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Curran (CPSO#: 81544 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES ANDREW CURRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES ANDREW CURRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004