THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:34:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3A- Pediatrics (Neurology)
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75613
Fax: (905) 521-7914

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neurology
Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramachandran Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ramachandran Nair (CPSO#: 81553 )
Business Address: Suite 3A - Pediatrics (Neurology)
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75613

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3A- Pediatrics (Neurology)
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75613
Fax: (905) 521-7914

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neurology
Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramachandran Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ramachandran Nair (CPSO#: 81553 )
Business Address: Suite 3A - Pediatrics (Neurology)
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75613

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Aug 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 15 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rajesh Ramachandran Nair may practise medicine independently in Paediatric
Neurology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rajesh Ramachandran Nair may practise medicine independently in Paediatric
Neurology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004